House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 605
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6244
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
File Number 12
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
House Calendar Number 50
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|