House | 03/31/2016 | File Number 336 | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | House Calendar Number 230 | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |