House | 06/02/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/18/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/18/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/13/2016 | Public Act 16-80 | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 389 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | File Number 41 | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | House Calendar Number 59 | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |