Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Public Act 16-45
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
File Number 768
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 552
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5560
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
File Number 733
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
File Number 483
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
House Calendar Number 304
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|