House | 03/15/2016 | File Number 37 | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | House Calendar Number 60 | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2016 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/10/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |