House | 03/24/2016 | File Number 173 | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | House Calendar Number 138 | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/11/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/16/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |