Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Public Act 16-82
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 538
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
File Number 273
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
House Calendar Number 198
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|