Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Public Act 16-83
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
File Number 737
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 510
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4971
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
File Number 685
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
File Number 175
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
House Calendar Number 140
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|