Senate | 05/31/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/13/2016 | Public Act 16-84 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 556 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/29/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | File Number 43 | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | House Calendar Number 63 | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/29/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/17/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |