House | 04/21/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 450 | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | File Number 590 | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | House Calendar Number 361 | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/17/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |