House | 04/25/2016 | File Number 719 | ||
House | 04/25/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 503 | ||
House | 04/25/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3625 | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | File Number 136 | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | House Calendar Number 118 | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/17/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |