House
|
06/02/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Public Act 16-97
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 568
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
File Number 748
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
File Number 525
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
House Calendar Number 327
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/29
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|