Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Public Act 16-10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
File Number 691
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 443
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4495
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
File Number 44
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
House Calendar Number 68
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|