House | 04/21/2016 | File Number 693 | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 455 | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4036 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | File Number 61 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | House Calendar Number 78 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/17/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |