House | 04/08/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | File Number 225 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 168 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/17/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |