Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
File Number 770
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 566
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5515
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
File Number 337
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
House Calendar Number 231
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|