House
|
06/01/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Public Act 16-99
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
File Number 694
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 456
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3832
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
File Number 176
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
House Calendar Number 141
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|