House | 06/10/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/06/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/03/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/31/2016 | Public Act 16-217 | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 483 | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | File Number 227 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 170 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2016 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/17/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |