House | 03/24/2016 | File Number 177 | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | House Calendar Number 142 | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/22/2016 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/17/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |