House | 04/08/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2016 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | File Number 107 | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | House Calendar Number 101 | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |