House | 03/29/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | File Number 138 | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | House Calendar Number 120 | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/09/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |