House | 04/30/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 570 | ||
House | 04/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/30/2016 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 04/30/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/30/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5746 | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | File Number 142 | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | House Calendar Number 124 | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |