House | 03/22/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |