House | 04/22/2016 | File Number 704 | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 471 | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4280 | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | File Number 460 | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | House Calendar Number 297 | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |