Senate | 04/30/2016 | File Number 772 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 559 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/29/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/29/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4458 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | File Number 64 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | House Calendar Number 81 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |