House
|
05/27/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2016
|
Public Act 16-35
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2016
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4293
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 374
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
File Number 65
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
House Calendar Number 82
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|