House | 04/05/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | No New File by Committee on Banking | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Banking | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | File Number 184 | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | House Calendar Number 149 | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/18/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |