Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Public Act 16-30
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
File Number 740
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 520
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4852
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
File Number 591
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
House Calendar Number 362
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|