House | 04/06/2016 | File Number 485 | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | House Calendar Number 306 | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/09/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/07/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Health | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/29 | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |