Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05353 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 5353
22 February Session, 2016 LCO No. 1279
3- *_____HB05353APP___040716____*
3+ *_____HB05353VA____030416____*
44 Referred to Committee on VETERANS' AFFAIRS
55 Introduced by:
66 (VA)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 5353
1111
1212 February Session, 2016
1313
1414 LCO No. 1279
1515
16-*_____HB05353APP___040716____*
16+*_____HB05353VA____030416____*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on VETERANS' AFFAIRS
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (VA)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING REQUIREMENTS FOR ADMISSION TO THE STATE VETERANS' HOME.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 27-103 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2016):
2929
3030 (a) As used in the general statutes, except chapter 504, and except as otherwise provided: (1) "Armed forces" means the United States Army, Navy, Marine Corps, Coast Guard and Air Force and any reserve component thereof, including the Connecticut National Guard performing duty as provided in Title 32 of the United States Code; (2) "veteran" means any person honorably discharged from, or released under honorable conditions from active service in, the armed forces; (3) "service in time of war" means service of ninety or more cumulative days except, if the period of war lasted less than ninety days, "service in time of war" means service for the entire period of war, unless separated from service earlier because of a service-connected disability rated by the Veterans' Administration, during a period of war; and (4) "period of war" has the same meaning as provided in 38 USC 101, as amended, except that the "Vietnam Era" means the period beginning on February 28, 1961, and ending on July 1, 1975, in all cases; and "period of war" shall include service while engaged in combat or a combat support role in Lebanon, July 1, 1958, to November 1, 1958, or September 29, 1982, to March 30, 1984; Grenada, October 25, 1983, to December 15, 1983; Operation Earnest Will, involving the escort of Kuwaiti oil tankers flying the United States flag in the Persian Gulf, July 24, 1987, to August 1, 1990; and Panama, December 20, 1989, to January 31, 1990, and shall include service during such periods with the armed forces of any government associated with the United States.
3131
3232 (b) As used in this part, "home" means the Veterans' Home maintained by the state; "hospital" means any incorporated hospital or tuberculosis sanatorium in the state and any state chronic disease hospital, or hospital for persons with mental illness, "veteran" means any veteran, [who served in time of war,] as defined in subsection (a) of this section, [and] who is a resident of this state, provided, if he or she was not a resident or resident alien of this state at the time of enlistment or induction into the armed forces, he or she shall have resided continuously in this state for at least [two years] thirty days; "eligible dependent" means any parent, wife or husband, or child of a veteran who has no adequate means of support; and "eligible family member" means any parent, brother or sister, wife or husband, or child or children under eighteen years of age, of any veteran whose cooperation in the program is integral to the treatment of the veteran.
3333
3434 Sec. 2. Subsection (c) of section 27-108 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2016):
3535
3636 (c) Any such veteran desiring care or treatment under the provisions of this chapter shall make application under oath to the Commissioner of Veterans' Affairs; but, if, by reason of his or her physical condition, he or she is unable to make such application, some other veteran may make such application in his or her behalf. Said commissioner, or his or her designee, shall have sole power to determine whether such veteran is entitled to admission to the home or to a hospital, [and] provided said commissioner or designee shall give preference to any such veteran who has resided continuously in this state for one year or more. Any such veteran, if admitted, may, upon application to the commissioner, receive transportation at the expense of the state from his or her place of residence to the home or such hospital. No veteran so admitted shall be discharged from the home except upon the approval of the commissioner or his or her designee. The commissioner shall have sole power to remove any veteran whose care and treatment is paid for by the state from any hospital to another and shall appoint such agents as are necessary to see that veterans admitted to hospitals are receiving necessary food, clothing, care and treatment.
3737
3838
3939
4040
4141 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4242 Section 1 July 1, 2016 27-103
4343 Sec. 2 July 1, 2016 27-108(c)
4444
4545 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4646
4747 Section 1
4848
4949 July 1, 2016
5050
5151 27-103
5252
5353 Sec. 2
5454
5555 July 1, 2016
5656
5757 27-108(c)
5858
5959
6060
6161 VA Joint Favorable
62-APP Joint Favorable
6362
6463 VA
65-
66-Joint Favorable
67-
68-APP
6964
7065 Joint Favorable