House
|
06/03/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Public Act 16-109
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
File Number 697
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 457
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4217
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
File Number 70
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
House Calendar Number 87
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2016
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|