House | 04/14/2016 | File Number 645 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 394 | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3827 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | File Number 71 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | House Calendar Number 88 | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |