House | 06/03/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/20/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/20/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/16/2016 | Public Act 16-111 | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 454 | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | File Number 116 | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | House Calendar Number 110 | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/09/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |