House | 04/30/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 580 | ||
House | 04/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/30/2016 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 04/30/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | File Number 230 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 173 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/22/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |