Senate | 04/30/2016 | File Number 774 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 564 | ||
Senate | 04/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/29/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/29/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4838 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | File Number 232 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 175 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/22/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |