Connecticut 2016 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05370 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 5370
22 February Session, 2016 LCO No. 1503
33 *01503_______LAB*
44 Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES
55 Introduced by:
66 (LAB)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 5370
1111
1212 February Session, 2016
1313
1414 LCO No. 1503
1515
1616 *01503_______LAB*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (LAB)
2323
2424 AN ACT INCREASING THE MINIMUM FAIR WAGE.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Subsection (i) of section 31-58 of the 2016 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2016):
2929
3030 (i) "Minimum fair wage" in any industry or occupation in this state means a wage of not less than six dollars and seventy cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2003, not less than six dollars and ninety cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2004, not less than seven dollars and ten cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2006, not less than seven dollars and forty cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2007, not less than seven dollars and sixty-five cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2009, not less than eight dollars per hour, and effective January 1, 2010, not less than eight dollars and twenty-five cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2014, not less than eight dollars and seventy cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2015, not less than nine dollars and fifteen cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2016, not less than nine dollars and sixty cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2017, not less than ten dollars and ten cents per hour, and effective January 1, 2018, not less than eleven dollars per hour, and effective January 1, 2019, not less than twelve dollars per hour, and effective January 1, 2020, not less than thirteen dollars per hour, and effective January 1, 2021, not less than fourteen dollars per hour, and effective January 1, 2022, not less than fifteen dollars per hour or one-half of one per cent rounded to the nearest whole cent more than the highest federal minimum wage, whichever is greater, except as may otherwise be established in accordance with the provisions of this part. All wage orders in effect on October 1, 1971, wherein a lower minimum fair wage has been established, are amended to provide for the payment of the minimum fair wage herein established except as hereinafter provided. Whenever the highest federal minimum wage is increased, the minimum fair wage established under this part shall be increased to the amount of said federal minimum wage plus one-half of one per cent more than said federal rate, rounded to the nearest whole cent, effective on the same date as the increase in the highest federal minimum wage, and shall apply to all wage orders and administrative regulations then in force. The rates for learners, beginners, and persons under the age of eighteen years shall be not less than eighty-five per cent of the minimum fair wage for the first two hundred hours of such employment and equal to the minimum fair wage thereafter, except institutional training programs specifically exempted by the commissioner.
3131
3232
3333
3434
3535 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3636 Section 1 July 1, 2016 31-58(i)
3737
3838 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3939
4040 Section 1
4141
4242 July 1, 2016
4343
4444 31-58(i)
4545
4646 Statement of Purpose:
4747
4848 To raise the minimum wage, incrementally, to fifteen dollars per hour.
4949
5050 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]