House | 04/21/2016 | File Number 687 | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/15/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/08/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | File Number 117 | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | House Calendar Number 111 | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Public Hearing 02/29 | ||
House | 02/22/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |