Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Public Act 16-106
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 5824
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
File Number 760
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 541
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5354
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4555
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
File Number 73
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
House Calendar Number 90
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|