House | 05/03/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 588 | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5548 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | File Number 236 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 179 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/29/2016 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |