House | 06/02/2016 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/20/2016 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/20/2016 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/16/2016 | Public Act 16-107 | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 474 | ||
House | 04/22/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | File Number 237 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 180 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/29/2016 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |