House | 04/12/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | File Number 346 | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | House Calendar Number 240 | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/11/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/29/2016 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |