House | 03/31/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | File Number 189 | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | House Calendar Number 154 | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |