House | 04/04/2016 | File Number 405 | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | House Calendar Number 267 | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Public Hearing 02/29 | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |