House | 04/12/2016 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | File Number 279 | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | House Calendar Number 204 | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |