House | 03/29/2016 | File Number 240 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | House Calendar Number 183 | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |