House | 04/13/2016 | File Number 592 | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | House Calendar Number 363 | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/24/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |