House
|
04/27/2016
|
File Number 742
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 511
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4641
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2016
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2016
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2016
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
File Number 280
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
House Calendar Number 205
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|