Senate | 04/29/2016 | Senate Calendar Number 550 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 04/29/2016 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/29/2016 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4700 | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | File Number 352 | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | House Calendar Number 246 | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2016 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |