House
|
05/31/2016
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2016
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2016
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Public Act 16-116
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
File Number 722
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Senate Calendar Number 488
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2016
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4655
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
File Number 463
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
House Calendar Number 300
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2016
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2016
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|