House | 03/16/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/15/2016 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2016 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/26/2016 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |